Coleman et al v. Affordable Care, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles T Coleman
Defendant: Affordable Health Care, Inc., Doug Brown, David Slezak, ACI Group Holdings, Inc., Affordable Health Care, LLC, Karol Twila, John A Faller and Paul Steelman
Not Yet Classified: Charles T. Coleman, DMD, A Professional Dental Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv10707
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by ACI Group Holdings, Inc., Affordable Care, LLC.(Hair, Galen) Modified filers on 7/1/2019 (sbs).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Before the Court is plaintiff Charles T. Colemans Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. [Doc. #7]. Defendant ACI Group Holdings, Inc. removed this lawsuit from state court to this Court on May 28, 2019, [Doc. #2], and paid the $400.00 filing/removal fee. There are thus no other fees or costs to pay in this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 6/26/2019. (cg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles T. Coleman, DMD, Charles T Coleman. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Eskinde, Veleka)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance by ACI Group Holdings, Inc. re #4 Order . (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Hair, Galen) Modified text on 6/7/2019 to correct event (ajn).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - This case is related to Civil Action No. 17-13015, previously allotted to U.S. District Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon, Section "S" of this Court. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is TRANSFERRED to Section S(3). Case transferred to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/30/2019. (NEF: Section S, Mag. 3) (sa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by ACI Group Holdings, Inc. By the Clerk.(jeg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC, St. Tammany Parish, case number 2018-12035 Sec B (Fee previously paid) filed by ACI Group Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- State Court Pleading)(Hair, Galen) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (jeg).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 **ERROR- See correct document rec doc 2** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC for the Parish of St. Tammany, case number 2018-12035 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7666615) filed by ACI Group Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Galen M. Hair added to party ACI Group Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft).(Hair, Galen) Modified on 5/29/2019 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Affordable Care, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Brown
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Slezak
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACI Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Health Care, LLC
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karol Twila
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Faller
Represented By: John Eric Bicknell, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Mae Kalis
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Steelman
Represented By: David C. Spinner
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T Coleman
Represented By: Veleka Eskinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Charles T. Coleman, DMD, A Professional Dental Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?