Professional Network Consulting Services, LLC v. Trane U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Professional Network Consulting Services, LLC
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc. and Trane US, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10774
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Trane US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Company for Trane US, Inc. (Cox, Marshall)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Bench Trial set for 4/6/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 7/5/2019.(attachment(s): #1 Pretrial Notice) (clc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Petition for Damages by Trane US, Inc..(Brown, Francis)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Response/Reply. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Trane US, Inc. to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Records)(Cox, Marshall) Modified event/linkage on 6/12/2019 (mm).
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Trane U.S., Inc. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, Louisiana, case number 2019-3460 "M" (13) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7669020) filed by Trane U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Francis Horatio Brown, III added to party Trane U.S., Inc.(pty:dft).(Brown, Francis) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Professional Network Consulting Services, LLC v. Trane U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Network Consulting Services, LLC
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Francis Horatio Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Horatio Brown, III
Represented By: Marshall Thomas Cox
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?