TCI Packaging, LLC v. HUB International Midwest Limited

Plaintiff: TCI Packaging, LLC
Defendant: HUB International Midwest Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv10861
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #12 First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by HUB International Midwest Limited.(Ralston, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by HUB International Midwest Limited re #9 MOTION to Dismiss. (mm)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/18/2019. (mm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: rec. doc. 9 by HUB International Midwest Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Ralston, Christopher) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (mm).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Jennifer Claire Bergeron for TCI Packaging, LLC. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/10/2019. (mm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Amended Complaint, #13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition. **Documents filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1 states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (mm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Jennifer C. Bergeron by TCI Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laizer, Edwin) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (mm).
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by TCI Packaging, LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss. (Laizer, Edwin) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/10/2019) (mm). Modified text on 7/10/2019 (mm).
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against HUB International Midwest Limited filed by TCI Packaging, LLC.(Laizer, Edwin) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/10/2019) (mm).
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by HUB International Midwest Limited. (Ralston, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial (3 days) set for 3/16/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 2/4/2020.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jjs)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by HUB International Midwest Limited. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Ralston, Christopher) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (mm).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/6/19.(jjs)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal as to HUB International Midwest Limited answer due 6/24/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and Defendant is granted an extension of time up to and including June 24, 2019 to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/6/2019. (mm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal by HUB International Midwest Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraatz, Arthur) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (mm).
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by HUB International Midwest Limited re #1 Notice of Removal. (Kraatz, Arthur) Modified linkage on 6/5/2019 (mm).
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by HUB International Midwest Limited. By the Clerk. (mm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 790-994 F (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7681061) filed by HUB International Midwest Limited. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Arthur Raymond Kraatz added to party HUB International Midwest Limited(pty:dft).(Kraatz, Arthur) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCI Packaging, LLC v. HUB International Midwest Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUB International Midwest Limited
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Kyle S. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCI Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Kane
Represented By: Edwin Christian Laizer
Represented By: Kyle Potts
Represented By: Jennifer Claire Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?