Savone et al v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Susanne Walls and Gladys Savone
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10902
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Susie Morgan.Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. 4 day Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 3/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(bwn)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND REASONS - Plaintiffs' #11 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Defendant's #19 request for oral argument is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this response instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry (See R. Doc. 19). All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately.** (sbs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by James River Insurance Company regarding #11 MOTION to Remand. (sbs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by James River Insurance Company re #11 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Request for Oral Argument, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Jusczak, Derrick) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (sbs).
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - The Preliminary Conference currently scheduled for July 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, AUGUST 1, 2019 AT 10:30 A.M. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue Submission Date re #11 Motion to Remand. The submission deadline for plaintiff's Motion to Remand (R. Doc. No. 11) is continued and reset for July 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION to Continue Submission Date - Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. Proposed Order should be added as a separate attachment to the motion and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-saved-pdf-files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned (bwn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date re #11 Motion to Remand by James River Insurance Company. (Jusczak, Derrick) Modified on 6/27/2019 to remove submission date and referral (bwn). (Main Document 14 replaced on 6/27/2019) (bwn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (bwn). (Main Document 14 and Attachment 1 replaced on 6/27/2019 with text searchable versions of the pdf documents.) (tsf)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Remand. **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 7/10/2019. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enroll John J. Elmer, Jr., as Additional Counsel of Record and Designate Trial Attorney for Gladys Savone and Susanne Walls. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Gladys Savone, Susanne Walls. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Notice of Submission)(Lassalle, Joseph) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record and Designate Trial Attorney John J. Elmer, Jr.. **Not necessary to select relief 'Motion to Appoint Counsel' for this document. Only the relief 'Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record' is necessary. Clerk modified docket text. No further action is necessary.** (sbs)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record and Designate Trial Attorney John J. Elmer, Jr. by Gladys Savone, Susanne Walls. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lassalle, Joseph) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (sbs).
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter James River Group, Inc., and James River Group Holdings, Ltd., as Corporate Parents. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by James River Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jusczak, Derrick)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by James River Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent James River Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent James River Group Holdings, Ltd. for James River Insurance Company (Jusczak, Derrick) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (sbs).
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Attachment 3 was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (sbs)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James River Insurance Company. By the Clerk.(sbs)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-12750 G-11 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7687624) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Derrick A. Jusczak added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jusczak, Derrick) Modified text on 6/6/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/6/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savone et al v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Walls
Represented By: Joseph G. Lassalle
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Savone
Represented By: Joseph G. Lassalle
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Derrick A. Jusczak
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Represented By: Paula Marcello Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?