Lossi v. Shaw, et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne V Lossi
Defendant: Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund, John Shaw and John Clarke
Not Yet Classified: Tulane Educational Fund Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv10937
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund, John Clarke. Attorney Julie Durel Livaudais added to party John Clarke(pty:dft).(Livaudais, Julie)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund answer due 7/30/2019. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/10/2019. (blg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )Attorney Julie Durel Livaudais added to party Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund(pty:dft).(Livaudais, Julie)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(mmv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund, John Clarke, John Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jls)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7691762) filed by Suzanne V Lossi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Michael Richard Allweiss added to party Suzanne V Lossi (pty:pla).(Allweiss, Michael) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lossi v. Shaw, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne V Lossi
Represented By: Michael Richard Allweiss
Represented By: Marynell Lapuyade Piglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Tulane Educational Fund Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Represented By: Julie Durel Livaudais
Represented By: Sarah Voorhies Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Clarke
Represented By: Julie Durel Livaudais
Represented By: Sarah Voorhies Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?