Guan v. USCIS New Orleans District Office, et al.
Plaintiff: Fang Guan
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, USCIS New Orleans District Office and Attorney General of the United States
Not Yet Classified: Attorney General of the United States U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2019cv11094
Filed: June 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; USCIS New Orleans District Office served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yang, Donglai)
July 27, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Donglai Yang of summon served on DHS on 06/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Yang, Donglai) Modified on 7/29/2019 (clw).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, USCIS New Orleans District Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jeg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
June 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USCIS New Orleans District Office, Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General of the United States U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7693170) filed by Fang Guan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit receipt N400, #5 Exhibit interview sheet, #6 Exhibit termination order of related case)Attorney Donglai Yang added to party Fang Guan(pty:selreq).(Yang, Donglai)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guan v. USCIS New Orleans District Office, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS New Orleans District Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fang Guan
Represented By: Donglai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Attorney General of the United States U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?