Addison, et al. v. Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, et al
Plaintiff: Frederick E Addison, Sr, Gloria Tolodano, Chandra Tigler, Oscar Tigler, Bridgette Johnson, Melodie Jones, Bruce Lightell, Kian Riley, Adelaine Fitzpatrick, Margarite Johnson, Terry Pete, Gerald Ford, Joseph Pete, Jr., Kirk Wells, Melvin Ursin, Merlene Grant, Steven Serpas, Glenda Primus, Vincent Eaton, Carla Ford, John Lowe, Jose Hernandez, Alexander Mitchell, Demonte Deteige, Andrea Pickney, Edward Cloudet, Monica Coleman-Lestrick, John Thompson, Gerald Polk, Lula Darden, Gary Meyers, Ethel Green, Tony Ross, Charles Lee Anderson, Willie Faye Brooks, Carolyn Polk, David Scott, Mary Ann Winningkof, Regina Pierre Griffin, Liz Hernandez, Aletha Scott, Sheila Baskin, Albertine Hargrave, Mary Wood, Kimberly Himel, Regina Mitchell, Doris Collins, Rickey Calligan, Wendy Gremillion, Verna Mae Gabriel, Rhonda Meyer, Juliane Rayburn, Barbara Addison, Glenda Builbeau, Warren Pickney, Pearl Pinkley, Rita Jones, Perry Andras, Cory Himel, Rebecca Wells, Ramona Byrd, Kimberly Engel, Santana Uthaisang, Roy Tolodano, Eric Brown, Kevin Woods, Karen Ross, Scott Gremillion, Elizabeth Lala, Mary Paul, Cari Serpas, Elizabeth Lowe and Ada Jackson
Defendant: Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Jefferson Parish, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc, Aptim Corp and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv11133
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 29, 2019 before Judge Susie Morgan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2019. (rsg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2019 re #18 MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 18) submitted to the Court.(Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (sbs)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adrian Frank Snead. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
July 15, 2019 Filing 44 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adrian Snead (Fee previously paid) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #3 E-Filing Registration)(James, Sara) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (sbs).
July 9, 2019 Filing 43 Memorandum in Reply to Defendants Joint Opposition to #18 MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(sbs)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limits. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/9/2019. (sbs)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Charles Rowe. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
July 5, 2019 Filing 40 **DEFICIENT** Amendment/Supplement to Document by All Plaintiffs re Notice of Deficient Filing. (James, Sara) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (sbs).
July 5, 2019 Filing 39 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limits by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading - Reply, #3 Proposed Pleading - Affidavit, #4 proposed Pleading Ex. A, #5 Proposed Pleading Ex. B, #6 Proposed Pleading Ex. C, #7 Proposed Pleading Ex. D, #8 Proposed Pleading Ex. E)(James, Sara) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (sbs).
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric C. Rowe (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7740869) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(James, Sara) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (jeg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 37 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adrian Frank Joseph (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7740584) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)Attorney Sara Eliza James added to party Ethel Green(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Eliza James added to party Elizabeth Lowe(pty:pla).(James, Sara) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (jeg).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1) the motion of Defendants Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Aptim Corp., and the Parish of Jefferson made pursuant to Rule 78.1 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana requesting oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Proceedings to State Court (ECF No. #18 ), is GRANTED; and, 2) the parties to this proceeding, through their respective counsel of record, shall appear before the Honorable Susie Morgan, District Judge, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, Section E, on Thursday, July 11, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #33 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 Joint Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Defendants regarding #18 MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taggart, David) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (sbs).
July 1, 2019 Filing 33 Defendants' Joint Memorandum of Law in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration Exhibit A, #4 Declaration Exhibit B, #5 Declaration Exhibit C, #6 Declaration Exhibit D, #7 Declaration Exhibit E, #8 Declaration Exhibit F, #9 Declaration Exhibit G, #10 Declaration Exhibit H, #11 Declaration Exhibit I, #12 Declaration Exhibit J, #13 Declaration Exhibit K, #14 Declaration Exhibit L, #15 Declaration Exhibit M)(Taggart, David) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (sbs).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Megan R Brillault. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael G. Murphy. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John H. Paul. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James B. Slaughter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/19/2019. Defendants will file one joint opposition to the #18 Motion to Remand by no later than Monday, 7/1/2019 at 5:00 p.m. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to reply to the joint opposition by no later than Friday, 7/5/2019 at 5:00 p.m. The parties will make their initial disclosures by Monday, 7/1/2019. The Court DENIED Plaintiff's motion seeking an order requiring a prompt Rule 26(f) conference. ORDERED that the #5 , #7 , #12 motions for extension of time to answer are DENIED IN PART AS MOOT to the extent they request an extension of time to file an answer, and GRANTED IN PART to the extent they request deferral of the Rule 26(f) conference until after the Court's order on the motion to remand. The Court DENIED AS MOOT the motions for expedited consideration of the motions for extension of time to answer. (sbs)
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael G. Murphy (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7712030) by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Taggart, David) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John H. Paul (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7712008) by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Taggart, David) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice James B. Slaughter (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7711982) by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Taggart, David) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #18 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Megan R. Brillault (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7711891) by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Taggart, David) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court, #19 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of #18 Motion to Remand Proceedings to State Court. **Filing attorney did not select All Plaintiffs as filers. Clerk added filers. Please be sure to select "All Plaintiffs" for all future filings on behalf of all plaintiffs.** (sbs)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 Answer to Complaint. **Answer should have been linked to the Notice of Removal by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking documents.** (sbs)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Barry S. Neuman. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Expedited Consideration of #18 Motion to Remand Proceedings to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Sara) Modified text and filers on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand Proceedings to State Court by All Plaintiffs. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6a, #9 Exhibit 6b, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(James, Sara) Modified text and filers on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Aptim Corp.(Barousse, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc.(Mims, Michael) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (sbs).
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Jefferson Parish.(Futrell, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION for Expedited Consideration re #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion.** (sbs)
June 14, 2019 Filing fee paid for Barry S Neuman re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100) (gk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Expedited Consideration re #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal by Aptim Corp. (Barousse, William) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (sbs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (sbs).
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal by Aptim Corp. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Barousse, William) Modified event and text on 6/17/2019 (sbs).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry S. Neuman (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by Frederick E Addison, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 ECF Registration Form)(James, Sara) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (sbs).
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Cross MOTION For Rule 26 Conference by Frederick E Addison, Sr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(James, Sara)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Jefferson Parish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Futrell, Michael) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (sbs).
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal by Jefferson Parish. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Futrell, Michael) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (sbs).
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mims, Michael) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (am).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Mims, Michael) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (am).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - This matter is related to Civil Action No. 18-7889, previously allotted to U.S. District Judge Susie Morgan, Section "E" of this Court. IT IS ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/12/2019. (NEF: Section E, Mags. 2 & 5)(sa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC for the Parish of Jefferson, case number 790-369 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7696661) filed by Waste Connections Bayou, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc, Louisiana Regional Landfill Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet re Associated Attorneys and Related Cases, #3 Statement LR 3.2 Statement re list of parties, #4 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #5 State Court Pleadings Appendix A, Volume 1 of 5, #6 State Court Pleadings Appendix A, Volume 2 of 5, #7 State Court Pleadings Appendix A, Volume 3 of 5, #8 State Court Pleadings Appendix A, Volume 4 of 5, #9 State Court Pleadings Appendix A, Volume 5 of 5, #10 State Court Pleadings Appendix B, Addison petition)Attorney Michael C. Mims added to party Louisiana Regional Landfill Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Mims added to party Waste Connections Bayou, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Mims added to party Waste Connections US, Inc(pty:dft).(Mims, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison, et al. v. Louisiana Regional Landfill Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Regional Landfill Company
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: John H. Paul
Represented By: Michael G. Murphy
Represented By: Megan R Brillault
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: David R. Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish
Represented By: Matthew Dara Moghis
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Michael S. Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Connections Bayou, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: John H. Paul
Represented By: Michael G. Murphy
Represented By: Megan R Brillault
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: David R. Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Connections US, Inc
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: John H. Paul
Represented By: Michael G. Murphy
Represented By: Megan R Brillault
Represented By: James B. Slaughter
Represented By: David R. Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aptim Corp
Represented By: John Michael DiGiglia
Represented By: Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.
Represented By: William A. Barousse
Represented By: Jonathan S. Ord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick E Addison, Sr
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Tolodano
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Tigler
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Tigler
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Johnson
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melodie Jones
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lightell
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kian Riley
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaine Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarite Johnson
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Pete
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Ford
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pete, Jr.
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Wells
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Ursin
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlene Grant
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Serpas
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Primus
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Eaton
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Ford
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lowe
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Mitchell
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demonte Deteige
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Pickney
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Cloudet
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Coleman-Lestrick
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thompson
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Polk
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Darden
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Meyers
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Green
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ross
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lee Anderson
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Faye Brooks
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Polk
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Winningkof
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Pierre Griffin
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Hernandez
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aletha Scott
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Baskin
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertine Hargrave
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wood
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Himel
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Mitchell
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Collins
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Calligan
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Gremillion
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Mae Gabriel
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Meyer
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliane Rayburn
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Addison
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Builbeau
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Pickney
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Pinkley
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Jones
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Andras
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Himel
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wells
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Byrd
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Engel
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santana Uthaisang
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Tolodano
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Brown
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Woods
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ross
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Gremillion
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lala
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Paul
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cari Serpas
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lowe
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Jackson
Represented By: Barry S. Neuman
Represented By: Byron M. Forrest
Represented By: Adrian Frank Snead
Represented By: Sara Eliza James
Represented By: Eric Charles Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?