Payton v. Touro Infirmary Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Gayl Therese Payton
Defendant: Touro At Home, Touro Infirmary Hospital and Douglas N. Lurie
Case Number: 2:2019cv11147
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter by Douglas N. Lurie. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Adams, Lionel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Douglas N. Lurie served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (sbs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Touro Infirmary Hospital served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (sbs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Touro At Home served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (sbs)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED IN PART. The deadline for Defendants Touro at Home and Touro Infirmary Hospital to file responsive pleadings is EXTENDED by twenty-one (21) days. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/18/2019. (sbs)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Touro At Home, Touro Infirmary Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission) Attorney Ann Marie LeBlanc added to party Touro At Home(pty:dft), Attorney Ann Marie LeBlanc added to party Touro Infirmary Hospital(pty:dft).(LeBlanc, Ann) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (sbs).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Douglas N. Lurie answer due 8/13/2019. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/18/2019. (sbs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. **Motion should have been linked to the Complaint. Clerk took corrective action by appropriately linking the documents. No further action necessary. (sbs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Douglas N. Lurie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Lionel David Adams added to party Douglas N. Lurie(pty:dft).(Adams, Lionel) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (sbs).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Douglas N. Lurie, Touro At Home, Touro Infirmary Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ cc Pauper Order, Complaint, & Pauper Letter)(mp)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on June 13, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(sbs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gayl Therese Payton. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sbs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas N. Lurie, Touro At Home, Touro Infirmary Hospital filed by Gayl Therese Payton. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payton v. Touro Infirmary Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touro At Home
Represented By: Kathryn Montez Caraway
Represented By: Ann Marie LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touro Infirmary Hospital
Represented By: Kathryn Montez Caraway
Represented By: Ann Marie LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas N. Lurie
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Lionel David Adams
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayl Therese Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?