Green v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: MICHELLE CAROLYN GREEN
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv11224
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Pauper Letter)(cg)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 7/19/2019. (cg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David F. Chermol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 6/17/2019. (cg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Carolyn Green. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Statement Application to Proceed In Forma Pauper, #2 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified event on 6/17/2019 (jeg). Modified to add referral on 7/19/2019 (mmv).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David F. Chermol (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7706444) by Michelle Carolyn Green. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (jeg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHELLE CAROLYN GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jeg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Michelle Carolyn Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Office of General Counsel, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)Attorney Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr added to party Michelle Carolyn Green(pty:pla).(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE CAROLYN GREEN
Represented By: Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?