Badon v. Amazing Care Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Badon
Defendant: Noell Berry, Jolanda Berry and Amazing Care Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11279
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:0002fi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Noell Berry served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Jackson, Mary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jolanda Berry served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Jackson, Mary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Amazing Care Services, LLC served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Jackson, Mary)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Issued by the Clerk on 8/7/2019.(mm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint. **1. Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (4). 2. Filing attorney did not select Noell Berry and Jolanda Berry as filers. Clerk added filers.** (mm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Amazing Care Services, LLC, Noell Berry, Jolanda Berry. Attorney Sonjia D. Kirk added to party Amazing Care Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Kirk, Sonjia) Modified filers on 8/6/2019 (mm).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that the following Section J cases are hereby reallotted to Judge Greg Guidry, Section T of this Court, effective as of the date of this Order. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Carl Barbier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(cg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amazing Care Services, LLC, Jolanda Berry, Noell Berry. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7714238) filed by Anthony Badon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Request for Issuance of Summonses, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Mary Bubbett Jackson added to party Anthony Badon(pty:pla).(Jackson, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Badon v. Amazing Care Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noell Berry
Represented By: Sonjia D. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolanda Berry
Represented By: Sonjia D. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazing Care Services, LLC
Represented By: Sonjia D. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Badon
Represented By: Mary Bubbett Jackson
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?