Williams v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jaren Valdiz Williams
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv11286
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7 on 6/24/2019.(cg)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 6/24/2019. (cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (cg).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jaren Valdiz Williams. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (jeg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Jaren Valdiz Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(jeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaren Valdiz Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?