Hutchins et al v. ANCO Insulations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Hutchins, Derek Hutchins, Dolan Hutchins and Evelyn Conerly Hutchins
Defendant: Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Anco Insulators, Inc., CBS Corporation, LGS Technologies, Buck Kreihs Company, Inc., General Electric Company, Owens-Illinois Inc, Certain-Teed Corporation, Bexar Canyon Management, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Union Carbide Coporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, John Crane Inc, Grefco, Inc., Maryland Casualty Company, International Paper Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, A.W. Chesterson Company, Crane Co., Crescent Materials Service Inc, IDEX Corporation, Triplex Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, CSR, Limited, FMC Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, McCarty Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Sank, Inc., Atwood & Morrill, A.W. Chesterton Company, Crane Company, CSR Ltd and CertainTeed Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11326
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 37 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Certain-Teed Corporation (Ormsby, Barbara)
August 16, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, by Certain-Teed Corporation.Attorney Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby added to party Certain-Teed Corporation(pty:dft).(Ormsby, Barbara)
August 14, 2019 Filing 35 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Corporation (Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 14, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Wrongful Death by Foster Wheeler Corporation.Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party Foster Wheeler Corporation(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 14, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiffs Original Petition and Wrongful Death by Ingersoll-Rand Company.Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party Ingersoll-Rand Company(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 13, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 9, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, by Buck Kreihs Company, Inc..Attorney H. Philip Radecker, Jr added to party Buck Kreihs Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Radecker, H.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for More Definite Statement by International Paper Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, Answer to Plaintiff's Original Pet for Damages and Wrongful Death by General Electric Company.Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 2, 2019 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bexar Canyon Management, Inc. (Barfield, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, by Bexar Canyon Management, Inc..Attorney David A. Barfield added to party Bexar Canyon Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Barfield, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation (Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, Answer to Orig Petition for Damages and Wrongful Death by CBS Corporation.(Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Consent to Removal by CBS Corporation Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal, by Goulds Pumps LLC.Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch added to party Goulds Pumps LLC(pty:dft).(McCulloch, Lauren)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for More Definite Statement by Owens-Illinois Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission)Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party Owens-Illinois Inc(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by LGS Technologies identifying Corporate Parent Loma Alta Corporation for LGS Technologies (Willie, Brett)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal by LGS Technologies. Attorney Brett F. Willie added to party LGS Technologies(pty:dft).(Willie, Brett) Modified on 8/1/2019 (cg).
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Triplex Inc. (Carpenter, Edward)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorneys Christopher Kelly Lightfoot, Richard J. Garvey, Jr, Edward J. Lassus, Jr for Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/25/19. (ko)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lightfoot, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Atwood & Morrill identifying Corporate Parent Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Weir Group PLC for Atwood & Morrill (Adams, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kelly Lightfoot on behalf of Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified on 7/23/2019 (cg).
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Atwood & Morrill.Attorney Jennifer E. Adams added to party Atwood & Morrill(pty:dft).(Adams, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Kay Clark on behalf of Derek Hutchins, Dolan Hutchins, Evelyn Conerly Hutchins. Attorney Meredith Kay Clark added to party Derek Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Meredith Kay Clark added to party Dolan Hutchins(pty:pla), Attorney Meredith Kay Clark added to party Evelyn Conerly Hutchins(pty:pla).(Clark, Meredith) Modified on 7/23/2019 (cg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Triplex Inc.Attorney Edward Wade Carpenter added to party Triplex Inc.(pty:dft).(Carpenter, Edward) Modified link and text on 7/21/2019 (cg).
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #6 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(Melancon, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Directive pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk(cg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE REC DOC. 3 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENTS** State Court Pleasings filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cg).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-6349 (Fee previously paid) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (cg).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 *FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC DOC. 3 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENTS***NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-6349 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7720225) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchins et al v. ANCO Insulations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGS Technologies
Represented By: Kevin John Webb
Represented By: Brett F. Willie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buck Kreihs Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar Canyon Management, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grefco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Materials Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triplex Inc.
Represented By: Edward Wade Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sank, Inc.
Represented By: H. Philip Radecker, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Hutchins
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolan Hutchins
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Conerly Hutchins
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?