Sarga International Limited v. JSC Murmansk Shipping Company
Plaintiff: Sarga International Limited
Defendant: JSC Murmansk Shipping Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11337
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the above matter is CONSOLIDATED with 2:18-cv-05544-JCZ-MBN. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation ALL CASES if it applies to all cases. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/24/2019. (Ref. 19-11337, 18-5544)(ajn)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/27/2019.(jeg) (NEF: Section A, Magistrate 5)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Gardner, W.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Attachment by Sarga International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, W.) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (jeg).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Deposit Funds Cash Bond pursuant to Federal Rule 65.1 and Local Rule 67.2 by Sarga International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, W.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JSC Murmansk Shipping Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7721776) filed by Sarga International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit Verification)Attorney W. Jacob Gardner, Jr added to party Sarga International Limited(pty:pla).(Gardner, W.) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarga International Limited v. JSC Murmansk Shipping Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarga International Limited
Represented By: W. Jacob Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: T. Patrick O'Leary
Represented By: Andrew Struben de Klerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSC Murmansk Shipping Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?