Lavin et al v. Practice Protection Fund et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Thomas, James A Leithead, III, Thomas E Lavin, Matthew S French, James G Redmann and Clark G Warden
Defendant: GERALD M ROBINSON, Practice Protection Fund, American Express Underwriters, Inc., A. J. Binder, Jeffrey Coco, John D Martin, Jack A Andonie, Inmedex, LLC, Lolly J Leger, Unidentified Party, Gerald M. Robertson, American Excess Underwriters, Inc, Practice Protection Alliance, LLC and Gerald M. Robinson
Case Number: 2:2019cv11348
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Frederic Theodore Le Clercq for Practice Protection Fund. Attorney Paul A. Tabary, III; Elizabeth Borne and Justin W. Stephens terminated. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/15/2019. (mm)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/15/2019.(mm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Practice Protection Fund re #11 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Holmes, Duris)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jack A Andonie, A. J. Binder, Jeffrey Coco, John D Martin, Gerald M. Robertson re #11 MOTION to Remand. (Staub, Perry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Frederic Theodore Le Clercq and Duris L. Holmes of Deutsch Kerrigan, L.L.P. to be substituted in place of Paul A. Tabary, III, Elizabeth Borne, and Justin W. Stephens of Tabary & Borne, LLP by Practice Protection Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Duris Lee Holmes added to party Practice Protection Fund(pty:dft).(Holmes, Duris)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re: rec. doc. 11 by Jack A Andonie, A. J. Binder, Jeffrey Coco, John D Martin, Gerald M. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Staub, Perry) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (mm).
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Remand. **Filing attorney did not select James G Redmann, Michael J. Thomas, Clark G Warden, Matthew S French, James A Leithead, III as filers. Clerk added filers.** (mm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Thomas E Lavin, James G Redmann, Michael J. Thomas, Clark G Warden, Matthew S French, James A Leithead, III. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Conrad) Modified filers on 7/24/2019 (mm).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Correct Party Name. IT IS ORDERED that the spelling of party Gerald M. Robertson, M.D.'s name be corrected from Gerald M. Robinson, M.D, in the caption of this action and elsewhere in the record of this action. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/15/2019. (am)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response/Reply. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Jack A Andonie, A. J. Binder, Jeffrey Coco, John D Martin, Gerald M. Robinson to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit State Court Service Record)(Staub, Perry) Modified text/linkage/event on 7/9/2019 (mm).
June 29, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Correct Party Name by Jack A Andonie, A. J. Binder, Jeffrey Coco, John D Martin, Gerald M. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Staub, Perry) Modified text on 7/1/2019 (am).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(clc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Jack A Andonie, A. J. Binder, Jeffrey Coco, John D Martin, Gerald M. Robinson for the following reason: Duplicate Payment; receipt number 053L7723458. (Staub, Perry)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Rico Standing Order, by Clerk. (cbs)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(clc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC, St. Tammany Parish, case number 2018-14846 B(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7723460) filed by Gerald M. Robinson, Jack A Andonie, Jeffrey Coco, A. J. Binder, John D Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Perry Roger Staub, Jr added to party Jack A Andonie(pty:dft), Attorney Perry Roger Staub, Jr added to party A. J. Binder(pty:dft), Attorney Perry Roger Staub, Jr added to party Jeffrey Coco(pty:dft), Attorney Perry Roger Staub, Jr added to party John D Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Perry Roger Staub, Jr added to party GERALD M ROBINSON(pty:dft).(Staub, Perry) Modified on 6/25/2019 (clc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavin et al v. Practice Protection Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD M ROBINSON
Represented By: Perry Roger Staub, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Protection Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth Borne
Represented By: Justin W. Stephens
Represented By: Frederic Theodore Le Clercq
Represented By: Paul A. Tabary, III
Represented By: Duris Lee Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Underwriters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. J. Binder
Represented By: Perry Roger Staub, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Coco
Represented By: Perry Roger Staub, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Martin
Represented By: Perry Roger Staub, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack A Andonie
Represented By: Perry Roger Staub, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmedex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolly J Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald M. Robertson
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Represented By: Perry Roger Staub, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Excess Underwriters, Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Borne
Represented By: Justin W. Stephens
Represented By: Paul A. Tabary, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Protection Alliance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Thomas
Represented By: Conrad Meyer
Represented By: Charles O. Taylor
Represented By: Clark G. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Leithead, III
Represented By: Conrad Meyer
Represented By: Charles O. Taylor
Represented By: Clark G. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Lavin
Represented By: Conrad Meyer
Represented By: Charles O. Taylor
Represented By: Clark G. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew S French
Represented By: Conrad Meyer
Represented By: Charles O. Taylor
Represented By: Clark G. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G Redmann
Represented By: Conrad Meyer
Represented By: Charles O. Taylor
Represented By: Clark G. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark G Warden
Represented By: Conrad Meyer
Represented By: Charles O. Taylor
Represented By: Clark G. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?