Guidroz et al v. HMO Louisiana, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ashley Guidroz and Mark Guidroz
Defendant: HMO Louisiana, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11349
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HMO Louisiana, Inc..(Sherburne, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. HMO Louisiana, Inc. is granted a 20-day extension of time, or until 8/20/2019, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/30/2019. (jls)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. **1) Main document filed on incorrect sized paper. All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. **2)Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (jls)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by HMO Louisiana, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company for HMO Louisiana, Inc. (Sherburne, Richard) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (jls).
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by HMO Louisiana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr added to party HMO Louisiana, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sherburne, Richard) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/29/2019) (jls). Modified event/text on 7/29/2019 (jls).
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; HMO Louisiana, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Piacun, Joseph)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HMO Louisiana, Inc.. (clw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HMO Louisiana, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7724169) filed by Mark Guidroz, Ashley Guidroz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Joseph S. Piacun added to party Ashley Guidroz(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph S. Piacun added to party Mark Guidroz(pty:pla).(Piacun, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidroz et al v. HMO Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Guidroz
Represented By: Joseph S. Piacun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Guidroz
Represented By: Joseph S. Piacun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMO Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica W. Chapman
Represented By: Allison Nunley Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?