Lassair et al v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Eric Lassair, Telejacks & Things, Inc. and Patricia Lassair
Defendant: ARS Aleut Remediation LLC, City of New Orleans, New Orleans City, Weston Solutions, Inc. and ARS International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11377
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: GRANTING #27 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines and continue the oral agrument date on the defendant city of New Orleans' Rule 12(b)(6) Dismissal Motion. IT IS ORDERED that the briefing deadline relative to the City of New Orleans' Rule 12 (b) (6) Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended from August 28, 2019 to October 9, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties appear before the Court on the 24th day of October, 2019, at 09:30 A.M. for participation in Oral argument on any and all Rule 12 (b) (6) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/19/2019.(am)
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Weston Solutions, Inc. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines and continue the oral agrument date on the defendant city of New Orleans' Rule 12(b)(6) Dismissal Motion by Eric Lassair, Patricia Lassair, Telejacks & Things, Inc. (Bagneris, Emile) Modified text on 8/16/2019 (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 Request of Summons Issued as to Weston Solutions, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re #15 Amended Complaint. (Bagneris, Emile) (Main Document 26 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am). Modified text on 8/16/2019 (am).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 Amended Complaint as to ARS Aleut Remediation LLC answer due 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/9/19. (ecm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.**2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.**3. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer as to #15 Amended Complaint by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Zotti, Rebecca) Modified text/removed referral and submission date on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Certify Class by Eric Lassair, Patricia Lassair, Telejacks & Things, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bagneris, Emile) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (am).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: GRANTING #17 Request for Oral Argument. IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is set for September 12, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to 7 minutes of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. 16), and all briefs shall be submitted by August 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/05/2019.(am)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Robert E. Dille & Rebecca Abbott Zotti for ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. Attorney Stanley A. Millan; Thomas A. Casey, Jr and Ryan Estes Johnson terminated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/5/19. (ecm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney.**Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.** (am)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert E. Dille, Rebecca A. Zotti, and Maron Marvel to be substituted in place of Ryan E. Johnson, Thomas A. Casey, Jr., Stanley A. Milan by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ryan) Modified text/removed submission date on 8/2/2019 (am).
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by City of New Orleans regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Laughlin, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of New Orleans. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Laughlin, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Patricia Lassair, Eric Lassair, Telejacks & Things, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Original Petition for Damages)(ko)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Complaint. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/29/19. (ko)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Complaint. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Leave to File Document. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.**2. Document should have been filed as an EXPARTE/CONSENT Motion with the proposed pleading and proposed order as attachments to the motion. Clerk took corrective attachment by separating the documents.** (am)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for leave to File First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Patricia Lassair, Eric Lassair, Telejacks & Things, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Original Petition for Damages)(Bagneris, Emile) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/29/2019) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #4 Proposed Pleading) (am). Modified text on 7/29/2019 (am).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Amended Notice of Removal (Original Petition) as to ARS Aleut Remediation LLC answer due 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/17/19. (ecm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casey, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 , #6 Notice of Removal (Original Complaint) as to City of New Orleans answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo 7/16/2019. (ecm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by City of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laughlin, Michael) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (am).
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC to #3 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Casey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/5/2019 to correct event(ajn).
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-6195 (Fee previously paid) filed by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC.(Casey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (ajn).
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC identifying corporate parent ARS International, LLC for ARS Aleut Remediation, LLC (Casey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (ajn).
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Removal by City of New Orleans Attorney Michael J. Laughlin added to party City of New Orleans(pty:dft).(Laughlin, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC (clw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-6195 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7728116) filed by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Thomas A. Casey, Jr added to party ARS Aleut Remediation LLC(pty:dft).(Casey, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassair et al v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARS Aleut Remediation LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Casey, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Estes Johnson
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Represented By: Stanley A. Millan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Michael J. Laughlin
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Donesia Diane Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARS International, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lassair
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Steven Joseph Rando
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Madro Bandaries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telejacks & Things, Inc.
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Steven Joseph Rando
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Madro Bandaries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lassair
Represented By: Emile Anthony Bagneris, III
Represented By: Steven Joseph Rando
Represented By: Suzette Peychaud Bagneris
Represented By: Madro Bandaries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?