Moore v. Brennan
Plaintiff: Tamara D Moore
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 2:2019cv11420
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Megan J. Brennan, Attorney General, U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Wilson, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: Request of Summons Issued as to Megan J. Brennan filed by Tamara D Moore re 1 Complaint. (Wilson, John) Modified text/removed linkage on 8/16/2019 (mm).
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mm)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry, Section "T" of this Court. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/9/2019.(jls)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 7/8/2019. (cg)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 30, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tamara D Moore. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration), #2 Proposed Order)(Wilson, John)
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Megan J. Brennan (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Tamara D Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Courtney Wilson added to party Tamara D Moore(pty:pla).(Wilson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara D Moore
Represented By: John Courtney Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?