Romero v. Romero
Plaintiff: Jason Romero
Defendant: Jaye Romero
Case Number: 2:2019cv11438
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Barry W Ashe no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(jrc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jaye Romero. (clc)(CC: Pla w/copy of Pauper Order/Pauper Letter)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 7/2/2019. (Attachment(s): #1 Pauper Letter) (clc).
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Romero. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (sa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jaye Romero filed by Jason Romero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaye Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?