Sims v. USAA General Indemnity Company, et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Sims
Defendant: James River Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Lyndon Southern Insurance Company, Rashai Smooth, GEICO Insurance Company, Sylvia Workman, James Rivers Insurance Company, Rashad Ketchens and Progressive Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11439
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by James Rivers Insurance Company re #6 MOTION to Remand. (Davidson, Jared)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Alfred Sims. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Notice of Submission) Attorney Bryan K. Jefferson added to party Alfred Sims(pty:pla).(Jefferson, Bryan) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (sbs).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Compliance. *Document should have been linked to the Notice of Removal, not the Directive of the Clerk. Clerk took corrective action by appropriately linking documents. ALSO, all CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-saved-pdf-files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned (sbs)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by James Rivers Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B)(Davidson, Jared) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (sbs).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal.(clw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, Louisiana, case number 2019-1336 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7735198) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jared A. Davidson added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Davidson, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. USAA General Indemnity Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Sims
Represented By: Bryan K. Jefferson
Represented By: Larry M. Aisola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: James R. Nieset, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth Walter Andrieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashai Smooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Workman
Represented By: Louis Howard Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rivers Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Represented By: Paula Marcello Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashad Ketchens
Represented By: Andrea C. Savorgnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrea C. Savorgnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?