Boudreaux et al v. DIRECTV, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Boudreaux, Butsaraphorn Sunprahat, Thomas Boudreaux and Meghan Boudreaux
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Directv, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Old Republic Insurance Company and DIRECTV Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv11465
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/8/2019.(jeg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Response/Reply. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is NOTICE of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary. 2. Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jeg)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance by All Defendants to #5 Directive List of Parties and Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hudson, Joshua) Modified text/event/attachment on 7/8/2019 (jeg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2019) (jeg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter DIRECTV Enterprises, LLC, DIRECTV Holdings LLC, DIRECTV Group, Inc., DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, and AT&T Inc. for DIRECTV Inc; Corporate Parents DIRECTV Holdings LLC, DIRECTV Group, Inc., DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, and AT&T Inc. for DIRECTV, LLC; Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Company; Corporate Parents Sedgwick Holdings, Inc., Sedgwick, Inc., and Stonepoint Capital for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by DIRECTV, LLC, Old Republic Insurance Company, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (clw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by DIRECTV, LLC, Directv, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Company, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parents DIRECTV Enterprises, LLC, DIRECTV Holdings LLC, DIRECTV Group, Inc., DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, and AT&T Inc. for DIRECTV Inc; Corporate Parents DIRECTV Holdings LLC, DIRECTV Group, Inc., DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC, and AT&T Inc. for DIRECTV, LLC; Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Company; Corporate Parents Sedgwick Holdings, Inc., Sedgwick, Inc., and Stonepoint Capital for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Hudson, Joshua) Modified text/corporate parents on 7/3/2019 (jeg).
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by All Defendants to Plaintiffs. (Hudson, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd Judicial District Court Terrebonne Parish, case number 185686 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7737010) filed by Old Republic Insurance Company, DIRECTV, LLC, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Directv, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Joshua Michael Hudson added to party DIRECTV, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Michael Hudson added to party Directv, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Michael Hudson added to party Old Republic Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Michael Hudson added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Hudson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux et al v. DIRECTV, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Boudreaux
Represented By: Sye J. Broussard
Represented By: Jackie Dove Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butsaraphorn Sunprahat
Represented By: Sye J. Broussard
Represented By: Jackie Dove Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Boudreaux
Represented By: Sye J. Broussard
Represented By: Jackie Dove Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Boudreaux
Represented By: Sye J. Broussard
Represented By: Jackie Dove Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Represented By: Windsor Victoria Richmond
Represented By: Casie Zimmerman Davidson
Represented By: David F. Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directv, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Represented By: Windsor Victoria Richmond
Represented By: Casie Zimmerman Davidson
Represented By: David F. Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Represented By: Windsor Victoria Richmond
Represented By: Casie Zimmerman Davidson
Represented By: David F. Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV Inc
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Represented By: Windsor Victoria Richmond
Represented By: Casie Zimmerman Davidson
Represented By: David F. Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?