Rashad v. Collecto Inc
Plaintiff: Hakim Rashad
Defendant: EOS CCA and Collecto Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11481
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Collecto Inc. by Hakim Rashad. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Proposed Order)(Imbraguglio, Niko)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ***DUPLICATE OF REC. DOC. #4*** SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Attachments: #1 1 - Summons, #2 2 - Green Card)(Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified on 8/5/2019 (ajn).
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney entered incorrect service date for parties served. Collecto Inc served on 7/29/19, answer due 8/19/19. No further action is necessary.** (pp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Collecto Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Green Card)(Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (pp). Modified service/answer due date on 8/5/2019 (mp).
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Collecto Inc. (pp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against EOS CCA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7738353) filed by Hakim Rashad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Niko Angelo Imbraguglio added to party Hakim Rashad(pty:pla).(Imbraguglio, Niko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rashad v. Collecto Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOS CCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakim Rashad
Represented By: Niko Angelo Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?