Hanberry v. Fedloan Servicing
Plaintiff: Angel M Hanberry
Defendant: Fedloan Servicing
Case Number: 2:2019cv11528
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Fedloan Servicing. Answer due 9/10/2019. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on August 14, 2019. (mp)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint by Fedloan Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Kelly McArdle Millet added to party Fedloan Servicing(pty:dft).(Millet, Kelly) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (mm).
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Fedloan Servicing served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (mm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fedloan Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter)(mmv) (Sms w/Pauper Ltr & Pauper Order mailed via US Mail to plaintiff)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/9/2019. (mmv)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angel M Hanberry. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fedloan Servicing filed by Angel M Hanberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanberry v. Fedloan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedloan Servicing
Represented By: Kelly McArdle Millet
Represented By: Bradley Clay Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel M Hanberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?