Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C. v. Heaphy et al
Plaintiff: Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C.
Defendant: Drew M. Heaphy and St. Bernard Port, Harbor & Terminal District
Case Number: 2:2019cv11586
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Scheduling Conference. Please DISREGARD this notice. It was filed into the wrong case. (cg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR--DISREGARD--Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas: Scheduling Conference held on 9/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. All discovery must be completed by 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (cg) Modified on 9/6/2019 (cg).
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Smith, Randall)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Drew M. Heaphy, St. Bernard Port, Harbor & Terminal District. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Garner, James)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #6 motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file responsive pleadings no later than August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 08/05/2019. (am)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Drew M. Heaphy, St. Bernard Port, Harbor & Terminal District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James M. Garner added to party Drew M. Heaphy(pty:dft), Attorney James M. Garner added to party St. Bernard Port, Harbor & Terminal District(pty:dft).(Garner, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; St. Bernard Port, Harbor & Terminal District served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Smith, Randall)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Drew M. Heaphy served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Smith, Randall)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Drew M. Heaphy and St. Bernard Port, Harbor & Terminal District. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jls)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7745044) filed by Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons St. Bernard Port, #5 Summons Heaphy)Attorney Randall A. Smith added to party Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C.(pty:pla).(Smith, Randall) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C. v. Heaphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew M. Heaphy
Represented By: Ashley Gremillion Coker
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Joshua Simon Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Bernard Port, Harbor & Terminal District
Represented By: Ashley Gremillion Coker
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Joshua Simon Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Dock Port, Inc., L.L.C.
Represented By: Randall A. Smith
Represented By: Mary N. Bennett
Represented By: Laura Tiffany Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?