Paulin v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Deven Paulin
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11661
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that John J. Elmer, Jr. shall be enrolled as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Deven Paulin. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the designation of trial attorney shall be removed from Edward J. Womac, Jr. and that John J. Elmer, Jr. shall be designated as trial attorney. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/7/2019. (sa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record John Elmer by Deven Paulin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lassalle, Joseph) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (sa).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Compliance. Exhibit A and Exhibit B were imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the images. (clw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance with Rule 3.2 by James River Insurance Company re #3 Order, #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garrison, Travis) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/26/2019) (clw). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/26/2019) (clw). Modified text on 7/26/2019 (clw).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James River Insurance Company. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-432 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7752374) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) Attorney Travis Lyon Garrison added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Garrison, Travis) (Attachment 2 and 6 reduced legal pages & replaced on 7/15/2019) (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulin v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deven Paulin
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph G. Lassalle
Represented By: John J. Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Travis Lyon Garrison
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?