Scott v. Complete Logistical Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOSEF SCOTT
Defendant: COMPLETE LOGISTICAL SERVICES, LLC, NOBLE DRILLING (U.S.) LLC and Noble Drilling U.S. LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11672
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING LOCAL CIVIL RULE 54.7 re #1 Complaint filed by Josef Scott (pp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Complete Logistical Services, LLC. Attorney David Latham Reisman added to party Complete Logistical Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Reisman, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Complete Logistical Services, LLC, Noble Drilling U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 SEAMEN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Complete Logistical Services, LLC, Noble Drilling U.S. LLC (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Josef Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Charles Arlen Braud, II added to party JOSEF SCOTT(pty:pla).(Braud, Charles) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (pp). Modified text on 8/1/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Complete Logistical Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEF SCOTT
Represented By: Charles Arlen Braud, II
Represented By: Steven Dewayne Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle O. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPLETE LOGISTICAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Brady McNeil Hadden
Represented By: David Latham Reisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBLE DRILLING (U.S.) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?