Sayles v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James Sayles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv11683
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. **Filing attorney entered incorrect service date for Social Security Administration. Social Security Administration served on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; U.S. Attorney served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Attorney General served on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, DOJ, #2 Summons Executed on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI, SSA)(Chermol, David) Modified text/answer due dates on 9/6/2019 (mm).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David F. Chermol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 7/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(pp)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7753758) by James Sayles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration, #3 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Loyd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7753733) filed by James Sayles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Office of General Counsel, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons United States Attorney Office)Attorney Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr added to party James Sayles(pty:pla).(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayles v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sayles
Represented By: Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?