Perkins v. Progressive Casualty and Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Carl Perkins
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance and Progressive Casualty and Insurance Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11705
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Progressive Casualty and Insurance Co. (cg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 17, 2019 Filing fee paid from Carl Perkins re #1 Complaint, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7758515) (Perkins, Carl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (cc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carl Perkins, Progressive Casualty Insurance (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Carl Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Carl Perkins added to party Carl Perkins(pty:pla).(Perkins, Carl) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/19/2019) (cg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/19/2019) (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Progressive Casualty and Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty and Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Perkins
Represented By: Carl Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?