Jackson v. Allemand
Plaintiff: Jevorrie Jackson
Defendant: Colonel Allemand
Case Number: 2:2019cv11707
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Receipt of Transferred Case to Western District of Louisiana (my)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court hereby approves the Report and Recommendation of the Chief United States Magistrate Judge and adopts it as its opinion in this matter. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint filed by the plaintiff, Jevorrie Jackson, is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/11/2019.(am)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the #1 Complaint filed by Jevorrie Jackson be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on August 28, 2019.(mp)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/7/2019. (sa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 *DEFICIENT* COMPLAINT against Colonel Allemand filed by Jevorrie Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Allemand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Allemand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jevorrie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?