Hickman v. Murray, et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Hickman
Defendant: Thomas J Murray, Jr., Rasier, LLC, Progressive Insurance Company, Uber Technologies, Inc., Unidentified Party and Raiser LLC
Not Yet Classified: Uber Technologies Inc., ABC Insurance Company and Progressive Ins Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv11711
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Limited Appearance with Client Acknowledgement by Gordon P. Guthrie, III, filed by Thomas J. Murray Jr. (Guthrie, Gordon) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/10/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 9/10/2019 (sbs).
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Thomas J Murray, Jr. Attorney Gordon P. Guthrie added to party Thomas J Murray, Jr.(pty:dft).(Guthrie, Gordon) Modified text on 9/6/2019 (sbs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on July 29, 2019.(mp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order by Raiser LLC. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Jared A. Davidson added to party Raiser LLC(pty:dft).(Davidson, Jared)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Rasier, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Rasier, LLC (Davidson, Jared)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Rasier, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B)(Davidson, Jared) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (sbs).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rasier, LLC. By the Clerk.(sbs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-6840 C-10 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7755676) filed by Rasier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Jared A. Davidson added to party Rasier, LLC(pty:dft).(Davidson, Jared) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2019) (sbs). (Attachments 1-2 replaced on 7/17/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 7/17/2019.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickman v. Murray, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Uber Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Progressive Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Gordon P. Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Represented By: Paula Marcello Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Hickman
Represented By: Walter C Morrison, IV
Represented By: Brittany Rose Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?