DHD Offshore Services, LLC v. Robert Lewis, Jr.
Plaintiff: DHD Offshore Services, LLC
Defendant: Robert Lewis, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11717
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: As stated herein, It has been brought to the Court's attention that Civil Action No. 19-11717, DHD Offshore Services, LLC v. Robert Lewis, Jr., is related to 19-11505. Accordingly; IT IS ORDERED that the above matters are hereby consolidated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2019.(mm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/8/2019.(blg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Robert Lewis, Jr served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (LaFleur, Ward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Robert Lewis, Jr. (pp)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (LaFleur, Ward) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/17/2019) (pp).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by DHD Offshore Services, LLC for the following reason: Duplicative; receipt number 053L-7756092 and 053L-7756181 re #1 Complaint,. (LaFleur, Ward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Lewis, Jr (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7756181) filed by DHD Offshore Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ward F. LaFleur added to party DHD Offshore Services, LLC(pty:clm).(LaFleur, Ward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DHD Offshore Services, LLC v. Robert Lewis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lewis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHD Offshore Services, LLC
Represented By: Ward F. LaFleur
Represented By: Julie I. Faulk
Represented By: Marc J. Mandich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?