Wheelahan v. New Orleans City
Plaintiff: Dawn Adams Wheelahan
Defendant: City of New Orleans and New Orleans City
Case Number: 2:2019cv11720
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Dawn Adams Wheelahan re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ordinance, #2 Exhibit Ordinance)(Wheelahan, Dawn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 and #12 MOTIONS to Dismiss: **Documents have been marked as filed in error. See rec. doc. 13 for corrected motion** (jls)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Lindsay, Shawn) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (jls).
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 **FILED IN ERROR - See rec. doc. 13 for corrected filing** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission)(Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jls).
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 **FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate filing of rec. doc. 13** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Lindsay, Shawn) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jls).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion for Recusal, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/20/2019. (jls)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Recusal by Dawn Adams Wheelahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wheelahan, Dawn)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to New Orleans City. Answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/7/2019. (jls)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Shawn Lindsay added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Lindsay, Shawn) Modified text/link on 8/7/2019 (clw).
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney entered incorrect service date for party served. New Orleans City served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. No further action is necessary.** (jls)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Wheelahan, Dawn) Modified service and answer date on 7/30/2019 (jls).
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (jls)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against New Orleans City filed by Dawn Adams Wheelahan.(Wheelahan, Dawn) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (jls).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Orleans City (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7756380) filed by Dawn Adams Wheelahan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Dawn Adams Wheelahan added to party Dawn Adams Wheelahan(pty:pla).(Wheelahan, Dawn) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheelahan v. New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Adams Wheelahan
Represented By: Dawn Adams Wheelahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Tanya L. Irvin
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Donesia Diane Turner
Represented By: Shawn Lindsay
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?