Mandeville City v. Purdue Pharma LP, et al
Plaintiff: Mandeville City
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Actavis Kadian LLC, McKesson Corporation, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Actavis LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Indivior Inc., Walmart Inc., Actavis Totowa, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Specgx LLC, Noramco, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Walgreen Company, Allergan USA, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Walmart, Inc. and Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11726
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 Receipt of Transfer Case to Northern District of Ohio (zmg)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Ohio Northern. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(jeg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: As stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed pending the decision of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel regarding transfer. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2019.(mm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Compliance by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey) Modified linkage on 8/8/2019 (mm).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Respond to the Petition re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/1/2019. (mm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Harry) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (mm).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, and that the joining Manufacturing Defendants1 be and hereby are granted a twenty-one (21) day extension of time to file a responsive pleading after a decision by the JPML regarding transfer of this matter to the MDL. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/29/2019. (jeg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mandeville City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Leger, Walter)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (mm).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **1. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Walmart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Company, CVS Health Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Kathryn) Modified linkage/filers on 7/24/2019 (mm).
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice (Other). **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section R Judge Sarah S. Vance.** (mm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Deadline to Respond to Complaint per State Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CVS Health Corporation (Flanagan, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Simon, Paul) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (mm).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by McKesson Corporation. By the Clerk. (mm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation . (Williams, Stacey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, St. Tammany Parish, case number 19-12787 D (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7758366) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Insys Therapeutics, Inc. bankruptcy pleading, #3 Exhibit Insys Therapeutics, Inc. bankrputcy pleading, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mandeville City v. Purdue Pharma LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandeville City
Represented By: Walter John Leger, III
Represented By: Brigid E. Collins
Represented By: Ross Forrest Lagarde
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Micah Collins Zeno
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: W. Michael Adams
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, L.L.C.
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris and Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Micah Collins Zeno
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Micah Collins Zeno
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Represented By: Karen M. Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Andy Joseph Dupre
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Reginald Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?