Sharp v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Justin Sharp
Defendant: AON Risk Services Southwest Inc., Alisa Martinez and Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11760
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Preliminary Status Conference set for 11/21/2019 01:45 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Prior to five (5) working days before the Status Conference, counsel for each party must submit a letter prepared in accordance with the Notice of Preliminary Status Conference attached. All discovery must be completed by 6/5/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Issued by clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ecm) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/13/2019 after correcting typo. Initial Disclosures are waived.) (ecm).
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. The Court will initiate the telephone conference call.(ecm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice (Other).**1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the text.**2. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to documents 1 and 6. Clerk removed linkage to document 6.** (am)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, List of Parties and Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Peterson, Megan) Modified text/removed linkage on 8/2/2019 (am).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #8 Motion is GRANTED and all claims and demands of plaintiff, Justin Sharp, against AON Risk Services Southwest, Inc. are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, reserving any and all rights of plaintiff to proceed against any other person, party, or entity, whether named or unnamed herein, including, but not limited to, Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. and Alisa Martinez. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/30/2019. (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION For Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice by Justin Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lambert, Charles) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (am).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc..(Peterson, Megan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by AON Risk Services Southwest Inc., Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Alisa Martinez. (pp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Celadon Group, Inc. for Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. (Peterson, Megan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Alisa Martinez re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff. (Peterson, Megan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Alisa Martinez re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to State Court. (Peterson, Megan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, case number 2019-0001497 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7761259) filed by AON Risk Services Southwest Inc., Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Alisa Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Megan Sara Peterson added to party AON Risk Services Southwest Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Megan Sara Peterson added to party Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Megan Sara Peterson added to party Alisa Martinez(pty:dft).(Peterson, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AON Risk Services Southwest Inc.
Represented By: Megan Sara Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisa Martinez
Represented By: Megan Sara Peterson
Represented By: M. Davis Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Sara Peterson
Represented By: M. Davis Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Sharp
Represented By: Charles Sterling Lambert, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen M. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?