Santa-Marina v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Santa-Marina
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, James River Insurance Company and Sanka Davis, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv11766
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 3/30/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/11/2019.(jeg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (dno).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue the Preliminary Scheduling Conference from 9/5/19, until 9/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/13/19. (dno)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 First MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference. Motion and Order must be two separate PDF images, Motion is the main document and the order is an attachment. Clerk took corrective action. (clw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 First EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Preliminary Conference by Kimberly Santa-Marina. (Rees, James) (Main Document 14 replaced on 8/13/2019) (clw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (clw). Modified text on 8/13/2019 (clw).
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (dno)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by James River Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent James River Group, Inc., James River Holdings, Ltd. for James River Insurance Company (Morris, Ebony) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (pp).
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sanka Davis, II, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Government Employees Insurance Company, Sanka Davis II (Pastorek, Kaitlin) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (pp).
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sanka Davis, II, Government Employees Insurance Company.(Pastorek, Kaitlin) Modified text/link on 8/9/2019 (pp).
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. This is a duplicate filing of document 8 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (clw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by James River Insurance Company re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Morris, Ebony)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 DUPLICATE: See Doc 8. Notice of Compliance by James River Insurance Company re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Morris, Ebony) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (clw).
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 5 to document 1. (clw)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by James River Insurance Company.(Morris, Ebony) Modified text/link on 7/24/2019 (clw).
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by James River Insurance Company.(pp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO ADVERSE PARTY by James River Insurance Company . (Morris, Ebony) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (pp).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-5903 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7762154) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ebony Shadae Morris added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Morris, Ebony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa-Marina v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlin Mary Pastorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Ebony Shadae Morris
Represented By: Randall C. Mulcahy
Represented By: Kevin Truxillo
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanka Davis, II
Represented By: Kaitlin Mary Pastorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Santa-Marina
Represented By: James S. Rees, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?