In the Matter of R&R Boats, Inc.
Petitioner: R&R Boats, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11768
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
3 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by R&R Boats, Inc. Cases associated: Create association to 2:19-cv-10610-MVL-JCW. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/25/2019.(sbs)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases by R&R Boats, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Cindy) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (sbs).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER APPROVING COMPLAINANTS' DECLARATION OF VALUE AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(sbs)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE Due to Collateral Proceedings. Case transferred to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/22/2019. (NEF: Judge Lemmon and Judge Wilkinson) (ajn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7762239) filed by R&R Boats, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification R. Harris, #3 Declaration-P. Beebe, #4 Declaration R. Boudreaux, #5 Letter of Undertaking, #6 Letter of Undertaking, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Notice of Complaint) Attorney Rufus C. Harris, III added to party R&R Boats, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Harris, Rufus) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of R&R Boats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R&R Boats, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty, III
Represented By: Rufus C. Harris, III
Represented By: Cindy Galpin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?