City of Slidell v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: City of Slidell and Slidell City
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Anda, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Smith Drug Company, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Novartis Pharmaceutical Corp., West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, L.L.C., Indivior Inc., Actavis Totowa, LLC, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Specgx LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., J M Smith Corporation, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc, CVS Orlando Fl Distribution, LLC, CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Invidior, Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Allegran Plc, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc, Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC, Walmart, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Walgreen Company, Acatvias Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: JM Smith Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11771
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 29 Receipt of Transfer Case to Northern District of Ohio (zmg)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(mm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: As stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed pending the decision of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel regarding transfer. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2019.(mm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/7/2019. (mm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/7/2019. (mm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter AmerisourceBergen Corporation as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. ** (mm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Richard Munice Crump added to party H.D. Smith, LLC(pty:dft).(Crump, Richard) Modified text/removed referral on 8/7/2019 (mm).
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC (Crump, Richard) Modified text/added corporate parent on 8/7/2019 (mm).
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by J M Smith Corporation, Smith Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brickman, Philip) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (mm).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #15 Motion. It is hereby Ordered that LOUISIANA WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, INC., without waiver of any defenses, shall be granted a 21-day extension of time to file a responsive pleading after a decision by the JPML regarding transfer of this matter to the MDL. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 08/02/2019. (am)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Perry, S.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, S.) Modified linkage/removed referral on 8/1/2019 (mm).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/30/2019. (mm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Compliance by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 & 3 combined)(Womack, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Slidell City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Leger, Walter)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (mm).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by by Walmart, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Orlando FL Distribution, LLC, CVS TN Distribution, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Kathryn) Modified linkage/filers on 7/24/2019 (mm).
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation . (Williams, Stacey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKesson Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (mm).
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC (Womack, Thomas) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (clw).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Tammany Parish, 22nd JDC, case number 2019-13022 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7762535) filed by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan Finance LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan Sales, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Womack, Thomas) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Slidell v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Douglas Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Philip C. Brickman
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp
Represented By: Kelly Cambre Bogart
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James Alcee Brown
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Represented By: Tyler D. Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Chad Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: W. Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bradley Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Smith Corporation
Represented By: Philip C. Brickman
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Reginald Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Ezra Dodd Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Paul B. Simon
Represented By: Samuel Edgar Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Orlando Fl Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invidior, Inc
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Represented By: Karen M. Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegran Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: S. Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Chad Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acatvias Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Slidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slidell City
Represented By: Sarah Perkins Reid
Represented By: Ross Forrest Lagarde
Represented By: Lawrence Emerson Abbott
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Represented By: Walter John Leger, III
Represented By: Brigid E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JM Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?