Willis v. Royal Sonesta, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GERNADA WILLIS
Defendant: Royal Sonesta, Inc. and Sonesta International Hotels Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11776
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Because the electronic record reveals that defendants Royal Sonesta, Inc. and Sonesta International Hotels Corporation have now waived service [Doc. #4 & 5], IT IS ORDERED that the call docket set on September 18, 2019 is CANCELLED, and plaintiff need no longer appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 9/11/2019.(cg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Royal Sonesta, Inc. on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Pieksen, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Sonesta International Hotels Corporation on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Pieksen, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 CALL DOCKET as to Gernada Willis - You are hereby notified that the captioned case will be called on WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 18, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Dana M. Douglas, 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Third Floor, Room B305, New Orleans, Louisiana. Counsel for plaintiff must appear IN PERSON and report on the status of the case and show cause why service has not been completed and/or why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 8/30/2019.(cg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7762987) filed by Gernada Willis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Oliver Pieksen, Jr added to party Gernada Willis(pty:pla).(Pieksen, John) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Royal Sonesta, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Sonesta, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonesta International Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERNADA WILLIS
Represented By: John Oliver Pieksen, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Edward Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?