Williams v. Ochsner Health Care System
Plaintiff: Natesha Williams
Defendant: Oschner Health Care System, Ochsner Health System and Ochsner Clinic Foundation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11778
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah S Vance
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Ochsner Clinic Foundation. (caa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ochsner Clinic Foundation filed by Natesha Williams.(caa)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/13/2019. (caa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. **Filing attorney did not select category 'Proposed Pleading' when attaching document for which leave to file is being requested. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint re #1 Complaint by Natesha Williams. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Summons)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (mm). Modified referral/text on 9/4/2019 (sa).
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Request for Summons Issued. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Page 2 of summons not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages if filing of returns of service becomes necessary pursuant to PTO 16. No further action necessary.** (mm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ochsner Health System. (mm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Ochsner Health System filed by Natesha Williams re #1 Complaint. (Blackman, Natalie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ochsner Health Care System (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7763417) filed by Natesha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Natalie Shalane Blackman added to party Natesha Williams(pty:pla).(Blackman, Natalie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2019) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ochsner Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natesha Williams
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oschner Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochsner Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochsner Clinic Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?