Muslow et al v. Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al
Plaintiff: Meredith Cunningham and Katherine Muslow
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Larry Hollier, Thomas Skinner, Jon Harman and Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Case Number: 2:2019cv11793
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Continue. #13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss will be submitted on 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/17/19.(ko)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Meredith Cunningham, Katherine Muslow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Christopher)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order: IT IS ORDERED that the automatic referral of this matter to the Magistrate Judge under Local Rule 73.2 is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 12(b)(6) Motion for Dismissal, R. Doc. 13, currently set for submission on September 25, 2019, before the Magistrate Judge, is hereby reset for submission on September 26, 2019, before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/11/2019.(am)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Counsel for plaintiff has advised that all parties do not consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28:636(c). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the preliminary conference set in this matter on September 24, 2019 is hereby CANCELLED. A jury trial has been demanded. A motion to dismiss is pending. Record Doc. No. #13 . The presiding district judge is hereby notified so that he may revoke the automatic referral, address the pending motion and schedule a conference to set pretrial and trial dates on his calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/11/2019. (NEF: Hon. Barry W. Ashe, Section M) (sa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 9/25/2019 before Magistrate Judge Wilkinson. Clerk took corrective action. (sa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Jon Harman, Larry Hollier, Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Thomas Skinner. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Alessandra, Maria) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (am). Modified submission date on 9/11/2019 (sa).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference is hereby SCHEDULED in this matter on 9/24/2019, at 11:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B409, New Orleans, Louisiana. The purpose of the conference is to determine if all parties consent to proceed before a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), and to plan future proceedings and set dates and deadlines, if appropriate. Parties who wish to participate in the conference by telephone may do so by contacting the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers at 504-589-7630 at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/15/2019.(caa)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Jon Harman; Larry Hollier; Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College; Thomas Skinner have an additional twenty-one (21) days or until and through, 9/10/2019, in which to respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/15/2019. (caa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Jon Harman, Larry Hollier, Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Thomas Skinner. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Maria Nan Alessandra added to party Jon Harman(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Nan Alessandra added to party Larry Hollier(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Nan Alessandra added to party Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Nan Alessandra added to party Thomas Skinner(pty:dft).(Alessandra, Maria)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Thomas Skinner served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
August 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed)(Williams, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jon Harman served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Larry Hollier served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jon Harman, Larry Hollier, Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Thomas Skinner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(sa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Christopher)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Williams, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7766639) filed by Katherine Muslow, Meredith Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Meredith Cunningham(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Katherine Muslow(pty:pla).(Williams, Christopher) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (sa). *WAIVER*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muslow et al v. Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hollier
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Skinner
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Harman
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Cunningham
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Peter Stephan Koeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Muslow
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Peter Stephan Koeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?