Charles Schwab & Co Inc v. Martinez
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co Inc
Defendant: Alfredo J. Martinez
Case Number: 2:2019cv11831
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Docket Call set for 10/8/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/18/2019.(blg)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael R. Greco. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7808035) by Charles Schwab & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit E-File Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Sorohan, Lawrence)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Alfredo J. Martinez served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Sorohan, Lawrence)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alfredo J. Martinez. (mp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Charles Schwab & Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Charles Schwab Corporation for Charles Schwab & Co Inc (Sorohan, Lawrence)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alfredo J. Martinez (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7771463) filed by Charles Schwab & Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Attorney Lawrence Joseph Sorohan, II added to party Charles Schwab & Co Inc(pty:pla).(Sorohan, Lawrence) (Attachment 3 & 4 replaced on 7/25/2019) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Schwab & Co Inc v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co Inc
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Sorohan, II
Represented By: Michael R. Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?