Mullet v. LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen G. Mullet
Defendant: LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC, Frances Rilley and Frances Riley
Case Number: 2:2019cv11851
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC, Frances Riley answer due 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/26/19. (ko)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC, Frances Rilley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Craig R. Watson added to party LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Craig R. Watson added to party Frances Rilley(pty:dft).(Watson, Craig)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC, Frances Rilley. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET SUBMITTED filed by Karen G. Mullet. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Albe, Joseph) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (pp).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7771563) filed by Karen G. Mullet.Attorney Joseph G. Albe, Jr added to party Karen G. Mullet(pty:pla).(Albe, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullet v. LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCMC Healthcare Partners, LLC
Represented By: Amanda M. Plaiscia
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Rilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Riley
Represented By: Amanda M. Plaiscia
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen G. Mullet
Represented By: Joseph G. Albe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?