Desvigne et al v. 1210841 Ontario Limited et al
Plaintiff: Mitchell Burton, Demicka Desvigne, Justive Desvigne and Malik Burton
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, 1210841 Ontario Limited d/b/a Flash Freight Systems, Old Republic Insurance, Old Republic Insurance Company of Canada, Old Republic Insurance Company, Flash Freight Systems, 1210841 Ontario Limited and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv11894
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Old Republic Insurance Company of Canada identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic Insurance Group for Old Republic Insurance Company of Canada (Otten, Christopher) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (am).
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Old Republic Insurance Company of Canada.Attorney Christopher Gerald Otten added to party Old Republic Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Otten, Christopher) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (am).
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Old Republic Insurance Company of Canada on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 (Otten, Christopher) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (am).
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by 1210841 Ontario Limited.Attorney Christopher Gerald Otten added to party Flash Freight Systems(pty:dft).(Otten, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 5 to document 1. (clw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.Attorney Bradley Scott Groce added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Groce, Bradley) Modified text/link on 7/30/2019 (clw).
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney attached a Notice of Corporate Disclosure to this removal instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the notice and docketing it as a separate entry. (pp)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 1210841 Ontario Limited (pp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2019-5756 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7775281) filed by 1210841 Ontario Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C)Attorney Christopher Gerald Otten added to party 1210841 Ontario Limited d/b/a Flash Freight Systems(pty:dft).(Otten, Christopher) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desvigne et al v. 1210841 Ontario Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Mark Messina
Represented By: Bradley Scott Groce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1210841 Ontario Limited d/b/a Flash Freight Systems
Represented By: Christopher Gerald Otten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Christopher Gerald Otten
Represented By: Franklin David Beahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flash Freight Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1210841 Ontario Limited
Represented By: Christopher Gerald Otten
Represented By: Franklin David Beahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Burton
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasielewski
Represented By: Timmy Lee Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demicka Desvigne
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasielewski
Represented By: Timmy Lee Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justive Desvigne
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasielewski
Represented By: Timmy Lee Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik Burton
Represented By: Jonathan D. Wasielewski
Represented By: Timmy Lee Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?