Jaime et al v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Anna Rebecca Gomez Avalos and Sandra Avalos Jaime
Defendant: Robert M. Cowan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Cindy Gomez, United States, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Department of Homeland Security, Cindy M. Gomez and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv11903
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 08:1255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erin Colleen Hebert, for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. **2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. (sa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSET MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Anna Rebecca Gomez Avalos, Sandra Avalos Jaime. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Statement Under Oath, #3 E-filing Registration Form)(Buck, Laura) Modified text/submission date/ referral on 8/1/2019 (sa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #4 Proposed Order) (sa).
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Summons requested. Filing attorney provided Summons on an incorrect form. Clerk took corrective action to prepare Summons with provided information and issued the Summons on the appropriate form. All future requests for Summons must be filed on the AO 440 form provided on the Court's website. No further action necessary. (sa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert M. Cowan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Cindy M. Gomez, Kevin McAleenan, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (sa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 *DEFICIENT* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7776722) by Sandra Avalos Jaime, Anna Rebecca Gomez Avalos. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Statement, #3 Proposed Order)(Buck, Laura) Modified on 7/30/2019 (sa).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert M. Cowan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Cindy Gomez, Kevin McAleenan, United States of America, Department of Homeland Security US Citizenship and Immigration Services, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7776646) filed by Anna Rebecca Gomez Avalos, Sandra Avalos Jaime. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) Attorney Laura N Buck added to party Sandra Avalos Jaime(pty:pla), Attorney Laura N Buck added to party Anna Rebecca Gomez Avalos(pty:pla).(Buck, Laura) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaime et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy M. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Rebecca Gomez Avalos
Represented By: Laura N Buck
Represented By: Erin Colleen Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Avalos Jaime
Represented By: Laura N Buck
Represented By: Erin Colleen Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?