Rodrigue et al v. Magnus et al
Plaintiff: Jacques George Rodrigue, Andre George Rodrigue, George Rodrigue Foundation of the Arts, Inc., Rodrigue Properties, LLC and Rodrigue Studios LLC
Defendant: Wendy Wolfe Magnus, George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc., Douglas Magnus, Life and Wendy Wolf Rodrigue
Case Number: 2:2019cv12036
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc., Douglas Magnus, Wendy Wolfe Magnus filed by Jacques George Rodrigue, Andre George Rodrigue, Rodrigue Studios, LLC, George Rodrigue Foundation of the Arts, Inc., Rodrigue Properties, LLC.(mp)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #8 Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED and the case is remanded to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is dismissed as MOOT. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 4, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (mp)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion filed by George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc., Douglas Magnus, Wendy Wolfe Magnus re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Flanagan, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion filed by George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc., Douglas Magnus, Wendy Wolfe Magnus re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . (Flanagan, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flanagan, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT on #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for 9/11/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 8/21/2019.(clc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to Rec. Doc. 3. Clerk properly linked document to Rec. Doc. 1. (mp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Compliance by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Flanagan, Thomas) Modified link/text on 8/20/2019 (mp).
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. (mp)
August 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Andre George Rodrigue, Jacques George Rodrigue. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Sternberg, Scott)
August 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Andre George Rodrigue, Jacques George Rodrigue. Motion referred to Micheal B. North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Sternberg, Scott) Modified referral on 8/19/2019 (mp).
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Conference held on 8/8/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the #5 Motion to Expedite is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #4 Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order is DISMISSED AS MOOT. (mp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Defendants' Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order by George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc., Douglas Magnus, Wendy Wolfe Magnus. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Flanagan, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order by George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc., Douglas Magnus, Wendy Wolfe Magnus. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Notice of Submission)(Flanagan, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc., Douglas Magnus, Wendy Wolfe Magnus.(mp)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 19-7973 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7791281) filed by Douglas Magnus, Wendy Wolfe Magnus, George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)Attorney Thomas M. Flanagan added to party George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Flanagan added to party Douglas Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Flanagan added to party Wendy Wolfe Magnus(pty:dft).(Flanagan, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodrigue et al v. Magnus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques George Rodrigue
Represented By: Scott L. Sternberg
Represented By: M. Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre George Rodrigue
Represented By: Scott L. Sternberg
Represented By: M. Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Rodrigue Foundation of the Arts, Inc.
Represented By: Scott L. Sternberg
Represented By: M. Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigue Properties, LLC
Represented By: Scott L. Sternberg
Represented By: M. Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigue Studios LLC
Represented By: Scott L. Sternberg
Represented By: M. Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Wolfe Magnus
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Rodrigue Life & Legacy Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Magnus
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Wolf Rodrigue
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?