Intact Insurance Co. et al v. Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Intact Insurance Co., Xpeditr Inc. and Xpeditr, Inc.
Defendant: Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc., Artisan Marketing, LLC and SCL Cold Chain, LLC
Interested Party: arbnwk
Case Number: 2:2019cv12044
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Thomas P. Owen, Jr. enrolled as counsel for Artisan Marketing, LLC. Attorneys Aaron E. Albert and Arthur L. Porter, Jr. terminated. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/12/19. (sbs)
August 12, 2019 Filing 55 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Thomas P. Owen, Jr. to be substituted in place of Aaron E. Albert and Arthur L. Porter, Jr. by Artisan Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Thomas P. Owen, Jr added to party Artisan Marketing, LLC(pty:dft).(Owen, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:18-cv-15612. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/1/2019. (ld, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana by INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC.. (LILLIS, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 7/23/2019. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 7/10/2019. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 LETTER ORDER that the Court will conduct a conference call with the parties on 7/23/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/10/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 50 Letter from John T. Lillis, Jr. re #49 Order. (LILLIS, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 LETTER ORDER that the Court will conduct a conference call with the parties on 7/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/5/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Settlement Conference held on 6/4/2019. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER - The parties are directed to promptly resubmit their separate confidential ex parte settlement position papers directly to Chambers via email (JBC_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov) prior to the settlement conference scheduled for today at 2:00pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/4/2019. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER allowing the representative of Dutchland and its insurer to participate via telephone for the settlement conference scheduled for 6/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/30/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 46 Letter from Thomas C. Martin. (MARTIN, THOMAS) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting SCL Cold Chain, LLC to participate by telephone in the settlement conference on 6/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/7/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Artisan Marketing, LLC permission to participate in the settlement conference on 6/4/2019 by telephone from Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/7/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 43 Letter from Aaron E. Albert re #42 Letter, #41 Scheduling Order. (ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 42 Letter from Narinder S. Parmar, Esq.. (PARMAR, NARINDER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/26/2019. (byl) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Letter Order, that Defendants motions to dismiss [ECF Nos. 19, 25, 34] are ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED without prejudice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/26/2019. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder none.) (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 39 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(LILLIS, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER - The parties are reminded that their Joint Discovery Plan is due by 4/22/2019. See [ECF No. 36]. Please review Docket No. 26 when completing the JDP. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/18/2019. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #34 MOTION to Dismiss as to Artisan Marketing, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Joint Stipulation by INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC.. (LILLIS, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that the initial conference is rescheduled to 4/25/2019 at 11:30 a.m. The parties shall work together and file a joint discovery plan by 4/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/26/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from John T. Lillis, Jr.. (LILLIS, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss as to Artisan Marketing, LLC MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 4/15/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss as to Artisan Marketing, LLC, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC. Responses due by 4/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration Decl of Brian Chehardy, #3 Declaration Decl of Arthur "Scott" L. Porter, Jr., #4 Exhibit Exh A Complaint, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time to respond by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC. (ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION re Update Answer Due Deadline, Update Answer Due Deadline, Update Answer Due Deadline, #28 Order by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC. (ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER - The Initial Conference in this matter scheduled for March 28, 2019 is adjourned to March 29, 2019 at 11:00 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/8/2019. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/19/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant Artisan Marketing, LLC's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint for an additional two-week extension through 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/5/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC.. (LILLIS, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/19/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant Artisan Marketing LLC's time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint by two weeks from 2/5/2019 through 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/5/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #24 Order, Update Answer Due Deadline, #1 Complaint, by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC. (ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/4/2019. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC.. Responses due by 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MARTIN, THOMAS) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that the motion at ECF No. #21 shall be terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/22/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC identifying (none) as Corporate Parent.. (ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by ARTHUR L. PORTER, JR on behalf of ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC (PORTER, ARTHUR) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Update Answer Due Deadline, #20 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulation on Consent)(ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON E. ALBERT on behalf of ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC (ALBERT, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction). Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC. Responses due by 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supporting Decl. of Popchock, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Popchock Decl, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(PARMAR, NARINDER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/24/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Defendant Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc.'s deadline to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is 1/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/16/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Order attached to docket entry #17 filed by the Clerk's office on 1/16/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice and the Clerk shall close this matter. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/15/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/22/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 Application for a Clerk's Extension of Time for Defendant Artisan Marketing to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Thomas Owen, Jr. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/16/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant SCL Cold Chain, LLC's time to answer until 1/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/2/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting attorney Spencer H. Kuhner's #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney SPENCER H. KUHNER terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/2/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC'S TIME TO ANSWER by SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC. (PARMAR, NARINDER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/2/2019. (mfr) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. (BIERMAN, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc... (MARTIN, THOMAS) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC.. (KUHNER, SPENCER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN T. LILLIS, JR on behalf of INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC. (LILLIS, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/2/2019. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC.. (PARMAR, NARINDER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NARINDER S. PARMAR on behalf of SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC (PARMAR, NARINDER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE W. WRIGHT on behalf of SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC (WRIGHT, GEORGE) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
November 2, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC, DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC., SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPEDITR INC.. (KUHNER, SPENCER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTACT INSURANCE CO. identifying INTACT FINANCIAL CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (KUHNER, SPENCER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC, DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC., SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9144155) with JURY DEMAND, filed by INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Artisan Marketing, LLC, #3 Summons Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc., #4 Summons SCL Cold Chain, LLC)(KUHNER, SPENCER) [Transferred from njd on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intact Insurance Co. et al v. Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: arbnwk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intact Insurance Co.
Represented By: SPENCER H. KUHNER
Represented By: JOHN T. LILLIS, JR.
Represented By: Spencer Heaton Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xpeditr Inc.
Represented By: SPENCER H. KUHNER
Represented By: JOHN T. LILLIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xpeditr, Inc.
Represented By: JOHN T. LILLIS, JR.
Represented By: Spencer Heaton Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artisan Marketing, LLC
Represented By: AARON E. ALBERT
Represented By: ARTHUR L. PORTER, JR.
Represented By: Thomas P. Owen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL Cold Chain, LLC
Represented By: NARINDER S. PARMAR
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?