The Pictsweet Company, Inc. v. Champion Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Pictsweet Company, Inc. and Pictsweet Company, Inc.
Defendant: jonathon buring, Champion Foods, Inc. and Donna Buring
Case Number: 2:2019cv12093
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing fee paid from Pictsweet Company, Inc. for Jason Reed re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7835793) (Hanemann, Stephen)
September 2, 2019 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for R. Jason Reed (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) by Pictsweet Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from CA Supreme Court, #2 Statement of Jason Reed, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hanemann, Stephen) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jls).
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Craig Boudreaux of Summons served on Champion Foods, Inc. on 08-15-2019. (Kean, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donna Buring, Jonathon Buring, Champion Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(pp)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 8, 2019 Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7796625) (Hanemann, Stephen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (cc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by The Pictsweet Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit B - Invoice, #3 Exhibit C - Pictsweet Packing Slip, #4 Exhibit D - Bill of Lading, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Champions Foods Summons, #7 Summons Donna Buring Summons, #8 Summons Jonathon Buring Summons)Attorney Stephen Christopher Hanemann added to party The Pictsweet Company, Inc. (pty:pla).(Hanemann, Stephen) (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/9/2019) (pp). (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/9/2019) (pp). (Attachment 7 replaced on 8/9/2019) (pp). (Attachment 8 replaced on 8/9/2019) (pp). Modified text on 8/9/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Pictsweet Company, Inc. v. Champion Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jonathon buring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Buring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Pictsweet Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Hanemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pictsweet Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Hanemann
Represented By: Richard C. Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?