Southwest TMS, LLC et al v. Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Southwest TMS, LLC and Cobia Energy, LLC
Defendant: Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12094
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cobia Energy, LLC, Southwest TMS, LLC (Gambel, Gary)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Goodrich Petroleum Corporation for Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC (Trew, Tyler)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (mmv)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC re #8 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Trew, Tyler)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jeg)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/28/2019. (jeg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Trew, Tyler) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (jeg).
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Remand. **This is a duplicate filing of document 8 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (jeg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion.**Document on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk h as reduced images. No further action needed.** (jeg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **This is a duplicate filing of document 9 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (jeg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Document on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jeg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(White, Ronald) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/19/2019) (jeg).
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Cobia Energy, LLC, Southwest TMS, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(White, Ronald) Response deadline due 9/2/2019 (mmv).
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 *ERROR_ Duplicate of rec doc 9** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cobia Energy, LLC, Southwest TMS, LLC re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . (White, Ronald) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/19/2019) (jeg). Modified on 8/19/2019 (jeg).
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 **ERROR- See Correct document, rec doc 8** MOTION to Remand by Cobia Energy, LLC, Southwest TMS, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(White, Ronald) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jeg).
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Trew, Tyler) Modified text/link on 8/15/2019 (pp).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC. (clw)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Trew, Tyler)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
August 8, 2019 Filing fee received from Trew, Tyler D.:Receipt 053L-7796453$ 400.00 (cc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, Parish of Tangipahoa, case number 163614 (Fee previously paid) filed by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Tyler D. Trew added to party Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC(pty:dft).(Trew, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest TMS, LLC et al v. Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest TMS, LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Gambel
Represented By: Ronald Joseph White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobia Energy, LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Gambel
Represented By: Ronald Joseph White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC
Represented By: Tyler D. Trew
Represented By: James E. Lapeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?