Rowland et al v. Centex Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Susan Rowland, Christopher Rowland and Matthew Rowland
Defendant: Centex Corporation, Lake Forest, LLC, Eagle, Inc., Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC, Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., LLC, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., CertainTeed Corporation, River Road Construction, Inc., Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C. and Union Carbide Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv12127
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND REASONS granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Remand Letter) (sbs)
September 3, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Christopher Rowland, Matthew Rowland, Susan Rowland re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/3/19. (ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.** (sbs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christopher Rowland, Matthew Rowland, Susan Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Cannella, David) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (sbs).
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #19 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future filings must reflect Section E. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Centex Corporation re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Lea) Modified on 8/29/2019 to edit docket text (bwn).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on 3 Motion to Remand filed by Susan Rowland, Matthew Rowland, Christopher Rowland. Defendant has until Wednesday, August 28, 2019, at 5:00 p.m., to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion to remand. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/23/2019.(sbs)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion filed by Centex Corporation re #6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Lea) Modified on 8/23/2019 to edit docket text (bwn).
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #4 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 Supplement to List of Parties and Pleadings by Centex Corporation re #11 Notice of Compliance, #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Certified Record Letter from Clerk of Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 of 8, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 8, #4 Exhibit 4 - Part 3 of 8, #5 Exhibit 5 - Part 4 of 8, #6 Exhibit 6 - Part 5 of 8, #7 Exhibit 7 - Part 6 of 8, #8 Exhibit 8 - Part 7 of 8, #9 Exhibit 9 - Part 8 of 8, #10 Exhibit 10 - Returns on Service of Process)(Smith, Lea) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (sbs).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/21/2019.(jeg)(NEF: Sections D and E)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Susan Rowland, Matthew Rowland, Christopher Rowland. By Clerk.(mmv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wendy B Vitter: Status Conference held on 8/16/2019. During the conference, the Court disclosed to counsel a potential conflict of interest. Counsel was advised of and will proceed using the remittal process. Counsel shall communicate with the Clerk of Court by 8/23/2019. (mm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Compliance List of Parties and Pleadings by Centex Corporation. (Smith, Lea)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter was randomly allotted to this section of the Court by the filing of the #1 Notice of Removal from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans on August 9, 2019. Because the undersigned would like to disclose a potential conflict with this matter, IT IS ORDERED that a status conference be and hereby is scheduled on Friday, August 16, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room C-368. If the attorneys are unavailable, participation by teleconference will be acceptable. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/13/2019.(mmv)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Centex Corporation. By the Clerk.(am)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 9/10/2019. Clerk took corrective action. (clw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Centex Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PulteGroup, Inc. for Centex Corporation (Smith, Lea)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Remand by Christopher Rowland, Matthew Rowland, Susan Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Cannella, David) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (clw).
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cannella, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christopher Rowland, Matthew Rowland, Susan Rowland. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Notice of Submission, #15 Proposed Order)(Cannella, David) Modified text/submission date on 8/13/2019 (clw).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Smith, Lea)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-8058 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7799282) filed by Centex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Dismissal Order for Defendant Kelly-Moore, #3 Exhibit C - Dismissal Order for Defendant Balfour Betty, #4 Exhibit D - Judgment Dismissing Defendant CertainTeed, #5 Exhibit E - Judgment Dismissing Defendant Gulf Belting & Gasket, #6 Exhibit F - Judgment Dismissing Taylor-Seidenbach, #7 Exhibit G - Judgment Dismissing Defendant Union Carbide, #8 Exhibit H - Judgment Dismissing Defendant River Road, #9 Exhibit I - Donald Richard Rowland's Social Security Earnings Report, #10 Exhibit J - Transcript Hearing on Dispositive Motions, #11 Exhibit K - All process, pleadings and orders served on Centex)Attorney Lea Ann Smith added to party Centex Corporation(pty:dft).(Smith, Lea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland et al v. Centex Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Corporation
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Forest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Belting & Gasket Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Road Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Rowland
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Boling
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rowland
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Boling
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rowland
Represented By: Jeremiah S. Boling
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?