Frank v. Option Care Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kelli Frank
Defendant: Option Care Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12144
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 9:00 AM before case manager by telephone. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on October 2, 2019.(mp)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Option Care Enterprises, Inc.(Perez, Kathlyn) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (sbs).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Option Care Enterprises, Inc. answer due 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/11/2019. (caa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Option Care Enterprises, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Kathlyn G. Perez added to party Option Care Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft).(Perez, Kathlyn) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (sbs).
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Option Care Enterprises, Inc. (sbs)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Arruebarrena, James)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Option Care Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7803337) filed by Kelli Frank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James Louis Arruebarrena added to party Kelli Frank(pty:pla).(Arruebarrena, James) (WAIVER OF SERVICE) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. Option Care Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Frank
Represented By: James Louis Arruebarrena
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option Care Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Kathlyn G. Perez
Represented By: Emily Olivier Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?