Dan Bunkering America Inc. v. GIS Tiger, et al
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering America Inc.
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC, GIS Tiger and GIS Marine, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12145
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 Process Receipt of Release of Seizure (am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Gis Tiger on 08/22/2019. (am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk.**Please, disregard previously issued correction.** (am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 **FILED IN ERROR**Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Claim.**Attorney(s) listed on pleading has not been enrolled in this case. If attorney, David Clay, intends to be co-counsel of record, a motion to enroll should be filed. If he doesn't intend to enroll, please remove name from signature block on all future pleadings. Signature block should only reflect attorneys that have made appearances. Any future filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (am) Modified on 9/10/2019 (am).
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 VERIFIED STATEMENT OF RIGHT OR INTEREST (Claim of Owner) by GIS Marine, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Verification)Attorney William Joseph Riviere added to party GIS Marine, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Riviere, William) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (am).
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Dan Bunkering America Inc. of Filing Proof of Substitute Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substitute Security)(Callihan, Lawton)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/15/2019. (am)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Dan Bunkering America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Callihan, Lawton) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (am).
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT of Arrest (in rem) issued. (3cc: USM) (am)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/13/2019. (3cc: USM)(am)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/13/2019. (3cc: USM)(am)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/13/2019. (NEF: District Judge & Magistrate Judge)(mm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel by Dan Bunkering America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callihan, Lawton)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Dan Bunkering America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callihan, Lawton)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7803342) filed by Dan Bunkering America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Dan Bunkering America Inc.(pty:pla).(Callihan, Lawton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Bunkering America Inc. v. GIS Tiger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIS Tiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIS Marine, L.L.C.
Represented By: William Joseph Riviere
Represented By: David Inge Clay, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering America Inc.
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Represented By: Matthew C. Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?